Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Giuseppe Menatti

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Oct 1686AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
3 Nov 1686Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
15 Nov 1688AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Mar 1692³ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
13 Sep 1694AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
5 Aug 1695DiedBishop of Como, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Giuseppe Menatti
Bishop Stefano Giuseppe Menatti (died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • c3+: CB
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 166, and Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,065
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast