Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Protonobilissimo

Deceased

Bishop of Trevico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645BornSpecchia
24 Aug 169348.6AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
20 Sep 169348.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
1 Jul 170156.5DiedBishop of Trevico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Protonobilissimo:
Bishop Francesco Protonobilissimo (died ) Bishop of Trevico

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013