Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Petirro

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1651³BornTaverna
6 Jun 168937.9AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
14 Dec 170554.4AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
24 Apr 170957.8DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Petirro:
Bishop Michele Petirro (born , died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 325, and Page 376
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015