Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Ventimiglia, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹BornPalermo
19 Jul 169450.5AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
25 Jul 169450.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
17 Dec 170965.9DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Ventimiglia:
Bishop Gerolamo Ventimiglia C.R. (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Lipari

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 245
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 26
  • c34: CB, 26 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 27 May 2015