Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Cantelmi, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1646Born
9 Mar 169346.5AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
24 Mar 169346.5Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
17 Jun 169649.7DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Michael Cantelmi
Bishop Michael Cantelmi O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 398
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast