Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Szczepan Koźmian

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1773³BornGałęzowie
25 May 179724.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 181946.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
27 Sep 181946.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
4 Jun 182047.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
10 Mar 182349.8AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
29 Jan 183157.7DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Szczepan Koźmian:
Bishop Józef Szczepan Koźmian (died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 137, and Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013