Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Atambua

Dioecesis Atambuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dominikus Saku, Bishop
  • Anton Pain Ratu, S.V.D., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kupang
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 5,177 (1,999 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan, Jl. Nela Raya 17, Lalian Tolu, Atambua 85702, Timor, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0389)23.25.741
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Timor Olandese
25 May 1936ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda Vicariate Apostolic of Timor Olandese (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Atambua
11 November 1948Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Timor Olandese Vicariate Apostolic of Atambua
Diocese of Atambua
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Atambua Diocese of Atambua
13 April 1967Territory LostDiocese of Atambua Diocese of Kupang (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Atambua
195087,184533,30016.3%38382,29441514ap1951
Diocese of Atambua
1970216,539270,95179.9%244464,70716380ap1971
1980276,928313,04888.5%1245574,858899930ap1981
1990365,741394,49992.7%3633695,3001578635ap1991
1999409,230438,82793.3%71381093,75415216039ap2000
2000421,715451,91293.3%64401044,05418519740ap2001
2001427,519456,72093.6%66421083,95811219740ap2002
2002442,400472,15093.7%70561263,51120619743ap2003
2003462,734487,76794.9%75481233,76215819848ap2004
2004475,775493,04496.5%81511323,60415428853ap2005
2006478,508503,50895.0%94491433,34615920554ap2007
2012553,712561,00098.7%130541843,00911926556ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013