Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodorus van den Tillaart, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Atambua, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1909Born
18 Aug 193526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
14 Nov 195748.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Atambua, Indonesia
14 Nov 195748.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulia
29 Jun 195848.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulia
3 Jan 196151.3AppointedBishop of Atambua, Indonesia
3 Feb 198474.4RetiredBishop of Atambua, Indonesia
7 May 199181.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Atambua, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Theodorus van den Tillaart
Bishop Theodorus van den Tillaart S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Atambua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeghel

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast