Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Leven, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Isole della Piccola Sonda, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Arca in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1883Born
29 Sep 191027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
25 Apr 193349.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda, Indonesia
25 Apr 193349.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Armenia
12 Nov 193350.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Armenia
21 Jun 195067.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Isole della Piccola Sonda, Indonesia
31 Jan 195369.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Isole della Piccola Sonda, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Leven
Bishop Heinrich Leven S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Isole della Piccola Sonda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLank

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast