Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomé Makhweliha, S.C.I.

Archbishop Emeritus of Nampula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1945 BornMpwaha
8 Dec 197328.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
24 Oct 199752.8AppointedBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
18 Jan 199853.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
16 Nov 200055.8AppointedArchbishop of Nampula, Mozambique
25 Jul 201671.5ResignedArchbishop of Nampula, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Tomé Makhweliha
Archbishop Tomé Makhweliha S.C.I. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nampula

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nampula.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,223
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Jul 2016