Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Júlio Duarte Cardinal Langa

Bishop Emeritus of Xai-Xai, Mozambique

Cardinal-Priest of San Gabriele dell’Addolorata


Motto: In Finem Dilexit Eos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1927 Born
9 Jun 195729.6Ordained PriestPriest of Joăo Belo, Mozambique
31 May 197648.5AppointedBishop of Xai-Xai, Mozambique
24 Oct 197648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Xai-Xai, Mozambique
12 Jul 200476.7RetiredBishop of Xai-Xai, Mozambique
14 Feb 201587.2Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201587.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gabriele dell’Addolorata
10 May 201587.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Gabriele dell’Addolorata

MicroData Summary
Júlio Duarte Langa
Júlio Duarte Cardinal Langa
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Xai-Xai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMangunze, Territorial Prelature of Mozambico
Ordained PriestCathedral, Lourenço Marques, Archdiocese of Lourenço Marques
Ordained BishopMangunze, Diocese of Xai-Xai

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Xai-Xai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • i: Bollettino, 4 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,383
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 249, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025