Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Manetti

Bishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1959 BornFirenze
19 Apr 198425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
31 Jan 201454.8AppointedBishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza, Italy
25 Mar 201454.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza, Italy
13 Apr 201455.0InstalledBishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Manetti:
Bishop Stefano Manetti (born ) Bishop of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Montepulciano-Chiusi-Pienza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2014
  • ob/i: CB, 7 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 21 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Mar 2014