Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Belleau

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornLisieux
18 Aug 162333.6SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
15 Jul 162434.5ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
16 Aug 163747.6DiedBishop of Meaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Belleau:
Bishop Jean de Belleau (born 1590, died ) Bishop of Meaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 237
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015