Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Henri de Pardaillon de Gondrin

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹BornGondrin
4 Nov 164323.8SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens, France
6 Feb 164525.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens, France
6 Feb 164525.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
14 May 164525.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
26 Jul 1646³26.6SucceededArchbishop of Sens, France
19 Sep 1674³54.7DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Henri de Pardaillon de Gondrin:
Archbishop Louis-Henri de Pardaillon de Gondrin (died ) Archbishop of Sens

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013