Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jacques Cardinal Davy du Perron

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1556Born
11 Dec 159236.0AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
27 Dec 159539.0Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
9 Jun 160447.5Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jan 160548.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
9 Oct 160649.8AppointedAdministrator of Evreux, France
9 Oct 160649.8AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
4 Jul 160851.6ResignedAdministrator of Evreux, France
5 Sep 161861.7DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Davy du Perron (VIAF: 22159293)
Jacques Cardinal Davy du Perron (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Lô, Normandy
Ordained BishopS. Louis des Français, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBagnolet (or Batignolles), Diocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Sens, Archdiocese of Sens

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
  • a cardinal for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 179
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 35, Number 173
  • b/c2+: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 57
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast