Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Octave de Bellegarde

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1587³Born
2 Dec 161326.8AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
25 May 161427.3Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
22 Nov 162134.8SelectedArchbishop of Sens, France
1623¹35.9ResignedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
18 Dec 162336.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens, France
26 Jul 164659.4DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Octave de Bellegarde
Archbishop Octave de Bellegarde (born Feb 1587, died ) Archbishop of Sens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaintes

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 160, and Page 313
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast