Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edson José Oriolo dos Santos

Bishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1964 Born
5 May 199025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil
15 Apr 201550.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
15 Apr 201550.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Segia
11 Jul 201550.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segia
30 Oct 201955.1AppointedBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Jan 202055.3InstalledBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edson José Oriolo dos Santos
Bishop Edson José Oriolo dos Santos (born ) Bishop of Leopoldina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItajubá, Archdiocese of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pouso Alegre, Archdiocese of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Leopoldina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,544
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast