Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcel Madila Basanguka

Archbishop of Kananga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1955 BornNdola, Zambia
30 Aug 198126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Feb 200448.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Feb 200448.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gigthi
29 May 200449.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gigthi
9 Dec 200651.5AppointedArchbishop of Kananga, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Marcel Madila Basanguka:
Archbishop Marcel Madila Basanguka (born ) Archbishop of Kananga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kananga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,646
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015