Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félicien Mwanama Galumbulula

Bishop of Luiza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1960 BornTshibala
9 Aug 198726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Jan 201453.2AppointedBishop of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
23 Mar 201453.4Ordained BishopBishop of Luiza, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Félicien Mwanama Galumbulula:
Bishop Félicien Mwanama Galumbulula (born ) Bishop of Luiza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Luiza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2014
  • ob: CB, 9 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 19 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014