Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Nkolo Kanowa, C.I.C.M.

Bishop of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1957 Born
Sep 1982³24.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
Sep 1986³28.9Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
19 Jul 198729.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
18 Feb 201759.4AppointedBishop of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 May 201759.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mweka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oscar Nkolo Kanowa
Bishop Oscar Nkolo Kanowa C.I.C.M. (born ) Bishop of Mweka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMbuji-Mayi
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame du Congo, Cathedral, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mweka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2017
  • ob: CB, 14 May 2017
  • c2+: CB, 27 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017