Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emery Kibal Nkufi Mansong’loo, C.P.

Bishop of Kole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1969 BornKimputu
31 Jul 199829.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Passion
2 Aug 199829.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
6 May 201545.8AppointedBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Aug 201546.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kole, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Emery Kibal Nkufi Mansong’loo:
Bishop Emery Kibal Nkufi Mansong’loo C.P. (born ) Bishop of Kole

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kole.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 May 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 May 2015
  • c34: CB, 9 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,558

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015