Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Manuel López

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rosario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1918BornRosario
19 Dec 194224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rosario, Argentina
20 May 196849.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
20 May 196849.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausafa
15 Aug 196850.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausafa
5 Apr 197253.8AppointedArchbishop of Corrientes, Argentina
19 Jan 198364.6AppointedArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina
18 Mar 198364.7InstalledArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina
20 Nov 199375.4RetiredArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina
22 Dec 200688.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rosario, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Manuel López:
Archbishop Jorge Manuel López (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rosario

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015