Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Butler (2nd)

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1742Born
25 May 177129.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 177331.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
15 Mar 177331.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
4 Jul 177331.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
17 May 177432.3SucceededArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
29 Jul 179149.5DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Butler (2nd) (VIAF: 17077204)
Archbishop James Butler (2nd) (born , died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopAmiens, Diocese of Amiens, France
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Thurles

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 153, and Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 22
  • b/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 15, and Page 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast