Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Dowling

Deceased

Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1840Born
7 Aug 186424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
14 Dec 188646.7AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
1 May 188747.1Ordained BishopBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
11 Jan 188948.8AppointedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
2 May 188949.1InstalledBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
6 Aug 192484.4DiedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Dowling (VIAF: 316945663)
Bishop Thomas Joseph Dowling (born , died ) Bishop of Hamilton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary's, Church, Hamilton, Diocese of Hamilton, Ontario
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Hamilton, Diocese of Hamilton, Ontario

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 448
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017