Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Asili

Deceased

Bishop of Lira, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1924Born
5 Jun 195530.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 196843.8AppointedBishop of Lira, Uganda
27 Oct 196844.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lira, Uganda
12 Oct 198864.0DiedBishop of Lira, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Cesare Asili
Bishop Cesare Asili (born , died ) Bishop of Lira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoyo

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast