Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Lucciardi

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1796BornSarzano
30 Jul 182023.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 184650.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
27 Dec 184650.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
10 Apr 185154.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
5 Sep 185154.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Senigallia, Italy
15 Mar 185255.3Elevated to Cardinal
18 Mar 185255.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
13 Mar 186467.3DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Lucciardi:
Cardinal Domenico Lucciardi (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 223, and Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 512, and Page 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013