Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bronzuoli

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1795BornFirenze
12 Jul 181823.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 184853.4AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
21 Sep 184853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
1 Mar 185660.9DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bronzuoli:
Bishop Francesco Bronzuoli (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013