Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Orfei

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1800BornOrvieto
20 Dec 182323.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 184847.9AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
17 Sep 184847.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
15 Mar 185857.4Elevated to Cardinal
18 Mar 185857.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
23 Mar 186059.4AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
22 Dec 187070.2DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Orfei:
Cardinal Enrico Orfei (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
  • a cardinal for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 168, and Page 477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013