Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Matteo Eustachio Cardinal Gonella

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1811BornTurin
18 Feb 183826.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 185038.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
26 May 185038.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
13 Jun 185038.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
1 Oct 186150.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
22 Jun 186654.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
13 Mar 186856.5Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 186856.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
15 Apr 187058.6DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Matteo Eustachio Gonella:
Cardinal Matteo Eustachio Gonella (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 406, and Page 593
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013