Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph de Révol

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1663BornVienne
11 Apr 170542.3SelectedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
7 Sep 170542.7ConfirmedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
8 Nov 170542.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
26 Jun 173572.5ResignedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
21 Mar 173976.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph de Révol:
Bishop Joseph de Révol (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)

  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013