Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques des Maretz

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655¹BornSoissons
15 Aug 168530.6SelectedBishop of Riez, France
7 Dec 169338.9ConfirmedBishop of Riez, France
24 Jan 169439.0Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
21 Jul 171358.5SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
20 Sep 171358.7ResignedBishop of Riez, France
26 Feb 171459.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
14 Mar 171560.2InstalledArchbishop of Auch, France
25 Nov 172570.8DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques des Maretz:
Archbishop Jacques des Maretz (born 1655, died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 108, and Page 331
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015