Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro José de Jesús Loza y Pardavé

Deceased

Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1812BornMéxico
19 Mar 183826.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 185240.2AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
22 Aug 185240.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
5 Dec 185240.9InstalledBishop of Sonora, México
22 Jun 186856.4AppointedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
23 Mar 186957.2InstalledArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Nov 189886.8DiedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Pedro José de Jesús Loza y Pardavé:
Archbishop Pedro José de Jesús Loza y Pardavé (born , died ) Archbishop of Guadalajara

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 46.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 292, and Page 524

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013