Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Mariano de Morales y Jasso

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1784³BornTangancícuaro
2 Jul 183247.8AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
18 Nov 183349.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
24 Feb 183651.5ResignedBishop of Sonora, México
1 Mar 184156.5AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
2 Jan 184257.3InstalledBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
27 Mar 184358.6DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angel Mariano de Morales y Jasso:
Bishop Angel Mariano de Morales y Jasso (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 349, and Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013