Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Díaz y Macedo

Deceased

Bishop of Tepic, Nayarit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1853BornGuadalajara
1 Apr 187522.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 189340.0AppointedBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
16 Apr 189340.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
5 Jul 189340.4InstalledBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México
14 Jun 190552.4DiedBishop of Tepic, Nayarit, México

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Díaz y Macedo:
Bishop Ignacio Díaz y Macedo (born , died ) Bishop of Tepic

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 541
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,031

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013