Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Melitón Vargas y Gutiérrez

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1822Born
10 Feb 185027.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188361.0AppointedBishop of Colima, México
27 May 188361.2Ordained BishopBishop of Colima, México
27 Jun 188361.2InstalledBishop of Colima, México
1 Jun 188866.2AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
2 Sep 188866.4InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
14 Sep 189674.5DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Melitón Vargas y Gutiérrez
Bishop Francisco Melitón Vargas y Gutiérrez (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAhualulco, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,104
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 214, and Page 557
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017