Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paula Díaz y Montes

Deceased

Bishop of Colima, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1833Born
25 May 186228.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 188955.6AppointedBishop of Colima, México
25 Aug 188955.8Ordained BishopBishop of Colima, México
6 Nov 188956.0InstalledBishop of Colima, México
14 Apr 189157.5DiedBishop of Colima, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Díaz y Montes
Bishop Francisco de Paula Díaz y Montes (born , died ) Bishop of Colima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatorce, Diocese of San Luis Potosí
Ordained PriestSan Francisco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Death PlaceSan Isidro

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 214
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,889, Number 47
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast