Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Buenaventura del Purísimo Corazón de María Portillo y Tejeda, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zacatecas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1827Born
8 Sep 185023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
9 Mar 188052.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of California Inferiore, México
9 Mar 188052.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricale
29 Jun 188053.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricale
25 Sep 188255.3AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
27 May 188962.0AppointedBishop of Zacatecas, México
14 Aug 188962.2InstalledBishop of Zacatecas, México
19 Jun 189972.1DiedBishop of Zacatecas, México

MicroData Summary for Buenaventura del Purísimo Corazón de María Portillo y Tejeda
Bishop Buenaventura del Purísimo Corazón de María Portillo y Tejeda O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Zacatecas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeocaltiche, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 202, and Page 564
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 600
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017