Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Antônio Lopes Ricci

Bishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1966 Born
10 Jul 199731.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 May 201750.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
10 May 201750.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tyndaris
16 Jul 201751.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tyndaris
6 May 202053.9AppointedBishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
4 Jul 202054.1InstalledBishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Antônio Lopes Ricci
Bishop Luiz Antônio Lopes Ricci (born ) Bishop of Nova Friburgo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBauru, Diocese of Bauru, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopSagrado Coração de Jesus, Bauru, Diocese of Bauru, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nova Friburgo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 May 2017
  • c2+: CB, 11 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,489
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2020
  • i: CB, 6 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 May 2020

Quantcast