Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Mangers, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oslo, Norway

Titular Bishop of Afufenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1889Born
3 Apr 192031.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
12 Jul 193243.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Oslo, Norway
12 Jul 193243.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Selia
24 Aug 193243.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selia
29 Jun 195364.2AppointedBishop of Oslo, Norway
25 Nov 196475.6RetiredBishop of Oslo, Norway
25 Nov 196475.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Afufenia
7 Jan 197282.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Oslo, Norway

MicroData Summary for Jacques Mangers
Bishop Jacques Mangers S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oslo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStolzemburg, Luxembourg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Luxembourg, Diocese of Luxembourg
Death PlaceLuxembourg, Diocese of Luxembourg

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,973
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,932, Number 55
  • loc: CB, 17 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast