Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Cheng Tien-Siang, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kaohsiung, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1922Born
28 Aug 195230.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Mar 196138.7AppointedBishop of Kaohsiung, Taiwan
21 May 196138.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kaohsiung, Taiwan
30 Oct 197957.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Kaohsiung, Taiwan
19 Aug 199068.1DiedBishop of Kaohsiung, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Cheng Tien-Siang
Archbishop Joseph Cheng Tien-Siang O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Kaohsiung

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoochow

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast