Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspard de Tressemanes de Brunet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Glandèves


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1721BornBrunet
29 Jun 175534.1SelectedBishop of Glandèves, France
24 Sep 175534.3ConfirmedBishop of Glandèves, France
19 Oct 175534.4Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
12 Sep 177150.3ResignedBishop of Glandèves, France
5 Sep 178463.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Glandèves, France

MicroData Summary for Gaspard de Tressemanes de Brunet:
Bishop Gaspard de Tressemanes de Brunet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Glandèves

  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015