Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Corecco

Deceased

Bishop of Lugano, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1931Born
7 Oct 195524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lugano, Switzerland
5 Jun 198654.6AppointedBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
29 Jun 198654.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
1 Mar 199563.4DiedBishop of Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Corecco
Bishop Eugenio Corecco (born , died ) Bishop of Lugano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAirolo

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast