Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Giacomo Grampa

Bishop Emeritus of Lugano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1936 BornBusto Arsizio, Italy
6 Dec 195923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lugano, Switzerland
18 Dec 200367.1AppointedBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
25 Jan 200467.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lugano, Switzerland
4 Nov 201377.0RetiredBishop of Lugano, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Pier Giacomo Grampa:
Bishop Pier Giacomo Grampa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lugano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lugano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,518
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 27 Nov 2013