Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Barthe, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trichinopoly, India

Titular Bishop of Parlais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1849Born
21 Mar 189040.9AppointedBishop of Trichinopoly, India
15 Jun 189041.1Ordained BishopBishop of Trichinopoly, India
19 Dec 191364.6ResignedBishop of Trichinopoly, India
19 Dec 191364.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Parlais
11 Nov 193485.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Trichinopoly, India

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Barthe
Bishop Jean-Marie Barthe S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trichinopoly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLézignan, France

  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 565
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast