Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de La Font de Savines

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viviers (Aps)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1742BornEmbrun
21 Apr 177836.1SelectedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
1 Jun 177836.2ConfirmedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
26 Jul 177836.4Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
28 Sep 180563.6ResignedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
1 Sep 181472.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Viviers (Aps), France

MicroData Summary for Charles de La Font de Savines
Bishop Charles de La Font de Savines (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viviers (Aps)

  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 444

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016