Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph de Fontanges

Deceased

Bishop of Lavaur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1718¹BornSaint-Flour
7 Apr 174830.2SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
2 Dec 174830.9ConfirmedBishop of Lavaur, France
22 Dec 174830.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
8 Nov 176446.8DiedBishop of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Joseph de Fontanges:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph de Fontanges (born 1718, died ) Bishop of Lavaur

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 433

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015