Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Lampra Cą

Auxiliary Bishop of Bissau

Titular Bishop of Leptiminus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1964 BornBlom
27 Dec 199734.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bissau, Guinea-Bissau
13 May 201147.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bissau, Guinea-Bissau
13 May 201147.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
12 Nov 201147.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptiminus

MicroData Summary for José Lampra Cą:
Bishop José Lampra Cą (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bissau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bissau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2011
  • ob: CB, 18 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013