Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Câmnate na Bissign

Bishop of Bissau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1953 BornMansoa
31 Dec 198229.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bissau, Guinea-Bissau
15 Oct 199946.4AppointedBishop of Bissau, Guinea-Bissau
12 Feb 200046.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bissau, Guinea-Bissau

MicroData Summary for José Câmnate na Bissign:
Bishop José Câmnate na Bissign (born ) Bishop of Bissau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bissau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,696

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013