Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mutare

Dioecesis Mutarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 25 June 1982
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Harare
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zimbabwe
  • Square Kilometers: 32,202 (12,438 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Drumfad, P.O. Box 47, Mutare, Zimbabwe
  • Telephone: (020)62347

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Umtali
2 February 1953ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Fort Victoria
Vicariate Apostolic of Salisbury
Prefecture Apostolic of Umtali (erected)
Diocese of Umtali
15 February 1957ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Umtali Diocese of Umtali
Diocese of Mutare
25 June 1982Name ChangedDiocese of Umtali Diocese of Mutare

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Umtali
197061,152637,2209.6%441451,3585992ap1971
198078,000817,0009.5%823312,516257118ap1981
Diocese of Mutare
199081,000936,0008.7%629352,314399819ap1991
1998117,0501,596,5007.3%831393,00144311721ap2001
2001119,5001,675,0007.1%1336492,4386312823ap2002
2002124,0581,985,0006.2%1539542,2976512726ap2003
2003125,3821,899,7246.6%1739562,2384512326ap2004
2004128,1201,925,4556.7%1536512,5124111226ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 2 Nov 2012