Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis-Roland Lambert, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port-Vila, Vanuatu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1921BornLawrence, MA, USA
29 Jun 194625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
31 Dec 197655.9AppointedBishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
20 Mar 197756.1Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
12 Dec 199675.8RetiredBishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
29 Oct 199776.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Francis-Roland Lambert:
Bishop Francis-Roland Lambert S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port-Vila

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013